Khalil v. Egyptair Airlines Company
Plaintiff: GEORGE KHALIL
Defendant: EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv04208
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m on October 9, 2019 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court by October 7th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/18/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Egyptair Airlines Company. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint has expired and there has been no further correspondence with the Court by Plaintiff. Accordingly, counsel for Plaintiff shall electronically file a status report setting forth how it intends to proceed with this case, no later than September 27th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/17/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Khalil. Egyptair Airlines Company served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Destefano, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Egyptair Airlines Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11685213 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by GEORGE KHALIL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Destefano, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khalil v. Egyptair Airlines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGYPTAIR AIRLINES COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Carlsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE KHALIL
Represented By: Charles Crane Destefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?