Hanley v. New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Claire Hanley and Claire Hanley, M.D.
Defendant: WAYNE J. RILEY, M.D, State University of New York Downstate Medical Center, Kings County Hospital Center, Patrick Hammill, Deborah L Reede, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc. and NEESHA PATEL, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04246
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the in person initial conference scheduled for 11/01/2019 is hereby advanced to 9/27/2019 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/26/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/26/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #9 is granted. Defendants Deborah L. Reede, M.D., Wayne J. Riley, M.D., and State University of New York Downstate Medical Center must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 9/30/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/15/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by the State Defendants - - by Deborah L Reede, Wayne J. Riley, M.D, State University of New York Downstate Medical Center. (Colucci, Clement)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #7 is granted. Defendants Kings County Hospital Center and New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 9/30/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/13/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clement J. Colucci on behalf of Deborah L Reede, Wayne J. Riley, M.D, State University of New York Downstate Medical Center (aty to be noticed) (Colucci, Clement)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File An Answer or to Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Kings County Hospital Center, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc.. (Anci, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 A.M. on 11/01/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 11/01/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/12/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claire Hanley, M.D.. Patrick Hammill served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Kings County Hospital Center served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Neesha Patel, M.D. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Deborah L Reede served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Wayne J. Riley, M.D served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; State University of New York Downstate Medical Center served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Conover, Bradford)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Hammill, Kings County Hospital Center, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc., NEESHA PATEL, M.D., WAYNE J. RILEY, M.D, Deborah L Reede, State University of New York Downstate Medical Center filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11690970 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Claire Hanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Conover, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanley v. New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE J. RILEY, M.D
Represented By: Clement J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State University of New York Downstate Medical Center
Represented By: Clement J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Hospital Center
Represented By: Joseph Anci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Hammill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah L Reede
Represented By: Clement J. Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Anci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEESHA PATEL, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Hanley
Represented By: Bradford D. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Hanley, M.D.
Represented By: Bradford D. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?