Maness v. CityRealty.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Moshe Maness
Defendant: CityRealty.com, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04300
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The request for a 30-day extension is granted, on consent. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/11/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CityRealty.com, LLC. (Tajika, Mioko)
August 12, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Application #5 granted, on consent. The new deadline is September 16, 2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/12/2019. (Cardenas, Alex)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CityRealty.com, LLC. (Tajika, Mioko)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by CityRealty.com, LLC (Tajika, Mioko)
July 26, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CityRealty.com, LLC from Supreme Court of New York, Kings County, case number 513562/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11700426) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Tajika, Mioko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maness v. CityRealty.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityRealty.com, LLC
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Maness
Represented By: Joseph Y Balisok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?