Vaccari v. Endliss Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Constantina Vaccari
Defendant: Endliss Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04441
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Remand to State Court, granting #7 Motion to Withdraw. The Notice of Removal (Dkt. No. 1), Notice of Appearance by Mitchell J. Katz, Esq. (Dkt.No. 2), and Civil Cover Sheets (Dkt. Nos. 3 and 4) are hereby withdrawn; andThe above-captioned action is hereby remanded back to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, Index No. 514555/2019.(Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/7/2019) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal and Related Filings (Stipulation and Proposed Order) by Endliss Technology, Inc.. (Katz, Mitchell)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Endliss Technology, Inc. (Katz, Mitchell)
August 2, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Endliss Technology, Inc. (Greenky, Ross)
August 2, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell J. Katz on behalf of Endliss Technology, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Katz, Mitchell)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endliss Technology, Inc. from New York State Supreme Court, Kings County, case number Index No. 514555/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11722962) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Greenky, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaccari v. Endliss Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantina Vaccari
Represented By: Joseph Lipari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endliss Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Michael Greenky
Represented By: Mitchell J. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?