Great Bowery Inc. v. Z57, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GREAT BOWERY INC., d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE and Great Bowery Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 - 10, inclusive, Z57, INC., IGD REAL ESTATE LLC, ERIK KOBLEY and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv04537
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants IGD Real Estate LLC, Erik Kobley and Z57, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/30/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by IGD Real Estate LLC, Erik Kobley, Z57, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) (Siff, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Erik Kobley shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/13/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Erik Kobley. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) (Siff, Brian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Douglas Siff on behalf of Erik Kobley (aty to be noticed) (Siff, Brian)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bowery Inc.. Erik Kobley served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Ngo, Rayminh)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant IGD Real Estate LLC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 7, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/10/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Scheduling Order,, #1 Complaint, by IGD Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Siff, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on November 15, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Z57, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/6/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Z57, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) (Siff, Brian)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Douglas Siff on behalf of Z57, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Siff, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bowery Inc.. IGD Real Estate LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Ngo, Rayminh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bowery Inc.. Z57, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Ngo, Rayminh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to IGD Real Estate LLC, Erik Kobley, Z57, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Great Bowery Inc. (Ngo, Rayminh)
August 7, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by GREAT BOWERY INC., d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Ngo, Rayminh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by GREAT BOWERY INC., d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright (Ngo, Rayminh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by GREAT BOWERY INC., d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons IGD Real Estate, #2 Proposed Summons Erik Kobley) (Ngo, Rayminh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 - 10, inclusive, IGD REAL ESTATE LLC, ERIK KOBLEY, Z57, INC. filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-11736471 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by GREAT BOWERY INC., d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ngo, Rayminh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Bowery Inc. v. Z57, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z57, INC.
Represented By: Brian Douglas Siff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGD REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Brian Douglas Siff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK KOBLEY
Represented By: Brian Douglas Siff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT BOWERY INC., d/b/a TRUNK ARCHIVE
Represented By: Rayminh Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Bowery Inc.
Represented By: Rayminh Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?