Wood v. Philadelphia Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Wood
Defendant: Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Philadelphia Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04568
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to adjourn conference #12 is granted. The initial conference is rescheduled for 10/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/24/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Adjourn Conference: Letter to request adjournment of 9/25/19 conference by Evelyn Wood (Vakarev, Peter) Modified on 9/24/2019 (Manson, Eddie).
September 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to substitute attorney #10 is granted. Attorney Igor Tarasov is hereby removed from the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/22/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Vakarev on behalf of Evelyn Wood (aty to be noticed) (Vakarev, Peter)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Aleksandr Vakarev on behalf of Plaintiff (Vakarev, Aleksandr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 AM on 9/25/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 9/25/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/18/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Paniccia, Samuel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F. Paniccia on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Paniccia, Samuel)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement served on Tarasov & Asssociates, P.C. on August 8, 2019, filed by Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Philadelphia Insurance Company. (Bradley, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Civil Coversheet served on Tarasov & Asssociates, P.C. on August 8, 2019, filed by Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Philadelphia Insurance Company. (Bradley, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Philadelphia Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp. for Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Philadelphia Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) (Bradley, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Philadelphia Insurance Company from Supreme Court - King County, case number 515057/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11742108) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service) (Bradley, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Philadelphia Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maguire Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Bradley
Represented By: Samuel F. Paniccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Bradley
Represented By: Samuel F. Paniccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Bradley
Represented By: Samuel F. Paniccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Wood
Represented By: Igor Tarasov
Represented By: Peter Vakarev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?