Accor Management US Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Marriott International Inc.,, E.C. Publications, Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, Public Storage, Sage Hospitality Resources, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC, CarMax, Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Bridgestone Americas Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, WB Studio Enterprises, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., Old Comp Inc., Ingram Micro Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., The Container Store, Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Caleres, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., AutoNation, Inc., OnStar, LLC, BJ's Restaurants, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., National General Management Corp., Accor Management US Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Directv, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Fitness International, LLC, Jack in the Box Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., LOEWS HOTELS HOLDING CORPORATION, Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, AT&T Corp., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Enterprise Holdings Inc., Nespresso USA, Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., DC Comics, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC and HBO Retail Ventures, Inc.
Defendant: Mastercard Incorporated, Visa International Service Association, Mastercard International Incorporated, Visa Inc. and Visa U.S.A. Inc,
Case Number: 1:2019cv04616
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 The case of Accor Management US Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al, has been transferred from District of California Northern to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 1:19-cv-04616-MKB-JO. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Marziliano, August)
August 12, 2019 Filing 61 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-04188. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER FROM MDL PANEL OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER-29 TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 59 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott International, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hyatt Hotels Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Fairmont Hotel Management Company, Other Affiliate Accor Management US Inc. for Fairmont Hotel Management L.P.; Corporate Parent FHI Finance (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Accor SA for Accor Management US Inc.; Corporate Parent Accor Management US Inc. for Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mountain Standard Group, LLC and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation OF FILING OF NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION AND CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Virginia K. DeMarchi is the referral judge assigned to case. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero is no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/8/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nestle Waters North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A., Other Affiliate Nestle Waters North America Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate San Pellegrino, SpA., Other Affiliate Nestle Enterprises S.A.S., Other Affiliate Nestle Waters S.A.S. for Nestle Waters North America Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nespresso USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A., Other Affiliate Nestle Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate NIMCO US, Inc., Other Affiliate Nestle US Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate Socite des Produits Nestle S.A. (SPN) for Nespresso USA, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by BJ's Restaurants, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for BJ's Restaurants, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Heart of America Management, L.L.C. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by OnStar, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company for OnStar, LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 46 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation on Defendant MasterCard International Incorporated of Summons; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Appearance on behalf of all Plaintiffs; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United Sates Magistrate Judge for Trial; Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ECF Registration Information; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Cover Sheet; Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Spero (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/31/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation on Defendant MasterCard Incorporated of Summons; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Appearance on behalf of all Plaintiffs; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United Sates Magistrate Judge for Trial; Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ECF Registration Information; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Cover Sheet; Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Spero (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/31/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation on Defendant Visa International Service Association of Summons; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Appearance on behalf of all Plaintiffs; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United Sates Magistrate Judge for Trial; Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ECF Registration Information; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Cover Sheet; Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Spero (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/31/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation on Defendant Visa U.S.A., Inc. of Summons; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Appearance on behalf of all Plaintiffs; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United Sates Magistrate Judge for Trial; Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ECF Registration Information; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Cover Sheet; Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Spero (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/31/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation on Defendant Visa Inc. of Summons; Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Notice of Appearance on behalf of all Plaintiffs; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United Sates Magistrate Judge for Trial; Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ECF Registration Information; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Civil Cover Sheet; Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Spero (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/31/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by White Lodging Services Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marquis Diversified Enterprises for Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation for Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Barcelo Corporacion Empresarial, S.A., Other Affiliate Barcelo Crestline Corporation, Other Affiliate BCE-BCC, LLC for Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CHECO Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Alleghany Corporation for Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 33 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bridgestone Corporation for Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fitness International, LLC (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Public Storage (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joshi Hotel Group, LLC (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Container Store, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Container Store Group, Inc. for The Container Store, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auro Hotels Management, LLC (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Comp Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gordon Brothers Group, LLC for Old Comp Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gordon Brothers Group, LLC (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingram Micro Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HNA Technology Co., Ltd. for Ingram Micro Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sephora USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton SE for Sephora USA, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enterprise Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Crawford Group, Inc. for Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CarMax, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Sage Enterprise Holdings, L.L.C., Other Affiliate MHV Holdings, LLC for Sage Hospitality Resources LLC. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qdoba Restaurant Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Quidditch Acquisition, Inc. for Qdoba Restaurant Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mananto Enterprises LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mananto Holding LLP for Mananto Enterprises LLC. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LEGO A/S for LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KIHR Holdings, Inc. for Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornerstone Brands, Inc., HSN, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Qurate Retail, Inc. for Cornerstone Brands, Inc., HSN, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flynn Restaurant Group LP (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caleres, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock Inc. for Caleres, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AutoNation, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of All Plaintiffs by Daniel Allen Sasse (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of Sections 1 and 2 of the Sherman Antitrust Act; Demand for Jury Trial against MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13538594.). Filed by Fitness International, LLC, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Jack in the Box Inc., National General Management Corp., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Public Storage, DC Comics, Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, The Container Store, Inc., LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., BJs Restaurants, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Sephora USA, Inc., Mananto Enterprises LLC, HSN, Inc., Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Old Comp Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, AT&T Corp., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Nespresso USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, LEGO Systems, Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, National General Holdings Corp., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, AT&T Mobility II, LLC, Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., WB Games Boston Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., AutoNation, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation, OnStar, LLC, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Telepictures Productions Inc., Mountain Standard Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., Ingram Micro Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., CarMax, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Caleres, Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - T, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/20/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accor Management US Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marriott International Inc.,
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.C. Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Lodging Services Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Standard Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Storage
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Hospitality Resources, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CarMax, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auro Hotels Management, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Americas Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyatt Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Studio Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telepictures Productions Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Comp Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingram Micro Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairmont Hotel Management L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Container Store, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility II LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleres, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AutoNation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OnStar, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJ's Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornerstone Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National General Management Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accor Management US Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qdoba Restaurant Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Directv, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cricket Wireless LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitness International, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack in the Box Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOEWS HOTELS HOLDING CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshi Hotel Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flynn Restaurant Group LP
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enterprise Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nespresso USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEGO Brand Retail, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DC Comics
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mananto Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Brothers Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HBO Retail Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Jordan Lee Ludwig
Represented By: Deborah Ellen Arbabi
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A. Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?