Johnston v. Bank Of America
Plaintiff: Jennifer Johnston
Defendant: Bank Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv04656
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., for Bank Of America. (Massand, Shan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank Of America (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to the attached Order for instructions on how to proceed in this case. Plaintiff shall promptly advise the Court once the defendant has been served. If service is not made upon the defendant by November 11, 2019, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, the Court will recommend that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any change of address. Failure to keep the Court informed of plaintiff's current address means the Court will not know where to contact plaintiff and may result in dismissal of the case. For information regarding court procedures, plaintiff may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/19/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank Of America. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653142679 (Davis, Kimberly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, filed by Jennifer Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?