Marrone v. Target Stores Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Marrone
Defendant: Target Stores Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04675
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Target Stores Inc.. (Warshaw, Aaron)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Stores Inc. (Warshaw, Aaron)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jinkal Pujara on behalf of Target Stores Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pujara, Jinkal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Warshaw on behalf of Target Stores Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Warshaw, Aaron)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony M. Marrone. Target Stores Inc. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Herrera, Isaiah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Target Stores Inc. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's #2 application to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915 is granted. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon the named defendant without prepayment of fees. The parties shall advise the Court by signing the enclosed form whether they jointly consent to trial and decision on this case by me, a United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/22/2019. C/mailed w/Attachments: #1 Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, #2 Consent to Trial and Decision by a United States Magistrate Judge. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony M. Marrone. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Stores Inc., filed by Anthony M. Marrone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrone v. Target Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Marrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Warshaw
Represented By: Jinkal Pujara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?