Mehmeti v. Jofaz Transportation Inc.
Plaintiff: Subi Mehmeti
Defendant: Jofaz Transportation Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04692
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01023. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/26/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, Dkt. #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Plaintiff contends that transfer is improper because the transferee court denied him his right to a trial. A party's dissatisfaction with the results reached by a federal court, however, does not justify filing in another judicial district in the hope of obtaining a different result. Rather than counsel against transfer, the transferee court's prior experience with the claims and defenses at issue further supports transfer. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is, accordingly, DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/9/19. (lcrdm1, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Transferring Pro Se Case by SUBI MEHMETI. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the US District Court for the Eastern District of New York: This action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, and defense counsel's motion to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. #4 , is DENIED as MOOT. See document for details. (Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.) Transfer due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/26/2019. (lcrdm1, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamie S. Felsen, :Firm- MILMAN LABUDA LAW GROUP PLLC, :Address- 3000 Margus Avenue, Lake Suggess, NY, 11022. Phone No. - Direct:(516) 303-1391; (516) 328-8899. Fax No. - (516) 328-0082 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JOFAZ TRANSPORTATION INC. (ztd); ("Leave to file Granted" signed 7/17/19 by Judge Randolph D. Moss) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/2/2019. (lcrdm1, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOFAZ TRANSPORTATION INC. served on 4/13/2019, answer due 5/4/2019 (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOFAZ TRANSPORTATION INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097590) with Jury Demand filed by SUBI MEHMETI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Z)(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Summons (1) Issued as to JOFAZ TRANSPORTATION INC.. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehmeti v. Jofaz Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jofaz Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Scott Felsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subi Mehmeti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?