Mondelus et al v. August West Developement, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antoine Jean Jean and Marie Mondelus
Defendant: The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, August West Developement, LLC, Eli Mashieh, Jason Steinberg and Frank Bee
Case Number: 1:2019cv04832
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Newman, Edward)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference #7 regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Court shall hold a pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss on Wednesday, November 13, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/16/2019. (Valderrama, Freddie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by August West Developement, LLC, Frank Bee, Eli Mashieh. (Richland, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Letter by Antoine Jean Jean (Jean-Louis, Macx)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: In direct contravention of the Court's Individual Practices, Plaintiff's letter response #9 to Defendants request #7 for a pre-motion conference regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss fails to "contain sufficient legal authority to" aid the Court in assessing the issues Plaintiffs intend to raise in their opposition to any motions to dismiss. Plaintiffs are directed to resubmit their letter responses to Defendants request in a manner that comports with the Court's Individual Practices by October 11, 2019. The failure to do so may result in the issuance of sanctions. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/10/2019. (Valderrama, Freddie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Letter by Marie Mondelus (Jean-Louis, Macx)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward K Newman on behalf of The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (aty to be noticed) (Newman, Edward)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Jason Steinberg. (Steinberg, Jason)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Mondelus. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Jean-Louis, Macx)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Mondelus. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit) (Jean-Louis, Macx)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by August West Developement, LLC. (Richland, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 22, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653142922 (Davis, Kimberly)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to August West Developement, LLC, Frank Bee, Eli Mashieh, Jason Steinberg, The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) .
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against August West Developement, LLC, Frank Bee, Eli Mashieh, Jason Steinberg, The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, filed by Marie Mondelus, Antoine Jean Jean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mondelus et al v. August West Developement, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Edward K Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: August West Developement, LLC
Represented By: Daniel H. Richland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Mashieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Steinberg
Represented By: Jason B. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Bee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Jean Jean
Represented By: Macx L. Jean-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Mondelus
Represented By: Macx L. Jean-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?