Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D., John Does 1 though 20, ABC Corporations 1 through 20, RAP Services, Inc., Valery Kotlyar a/k/a Valeriy Kotlyar, Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC, Valery Kotlyar and Valeriy Kotlyar
Case Number: 1:2019cv04881
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Valery Kotlyar has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Valery Kotlyar is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant RAP Services, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant RAP Services, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 4:00 p.m. on November 15, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Cecile I Fray, M.D. and Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 28, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/15/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Certificate of Default by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Hlinka, Vanessa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Certificate of Default by Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Hlinka, Vanessa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC, Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D.. (Eisenberg, Lloyd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruya Carton on behalf of Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC, Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D. (aty to be noticed) (Carton, Ruya)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd M. Eisenberg on behalf of Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC, Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D. (aty to be noticed) (Eisenberg, Lloyd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D. served on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Hlinka, Vanessa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M Malone on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Malone, Shaun)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Callinan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Callinan, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019; Valery Kotlyar served on 9/2/2019, answer due 9/23/2019; RAP Services, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons returned executed, #2 Summons returned executed) (Hlinka, Vanessa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent F. Gerbino on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gerbino, Vincent)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa H. Hlinka on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Hlinka, Vanessa)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11793478 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Fraudulent Billing Chart, #4 Chart) (Hlinka, Vanessa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/27/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #5 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecile Ingrid Fray, M.D.
Represented By: Lloyd M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Ruya Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 though 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAP Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valery Kotlyar a/k/a Valeriy Kotlyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecile I Fray, M.D., PLLC
Represented By: Lloyd M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Ruya Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valery Kotlyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeriy Kotlyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Represented By: Vincent F. Gerbino
Represented By: Michael Anthony Callinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Represented By: Vincent F. Gerbino
Represented By: Michael Anthony Callinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Represented By: Vincent F. Gerbino
Represented By: Michael Anthony Callinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Vanessa H. Hlinka
Represented By: Vincent F. Gerbino
Represented By: Shaun M Malone
Represented By: Michael Anthony Callinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?