Houston v. American Airlines , Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Addie Houston
Defendant: John Doe Corporation, Jack Doe, American Airlines, Inc. and Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05065
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is not available on November 20, 2019. The Initial Conference set for November 21, 2019 is rescheduled to November 22, 2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/28/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Addie Houston. (Zeitzoff, David)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 21, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bohlander, Nathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Bohlander, Nathan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Amended Complaint as to American Airlines, Inc., Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 American Airlines, Inc. Summons) (Piper, Francine)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Addie Houston (Zeitzoff, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Addie Houston (Zeitzoff, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc., Jack Doe, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc., filed by Addie Houston. (Zeitzoff, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bohlander, Nathan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Addie Houston. American Airlines, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Zeitzoff, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Addie Houston (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11820942 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Addie Houston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bohrer, Abram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. American Airlines , Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Bohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Bohlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addie Houston
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?