Kim v. Collecto, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heesoo Kim
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05089
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Collecto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Verizon invoice with April 2015 payment, #2 Certificate of Service) (Quinn, Lori)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 12/5/2019 @ 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/4/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Collecto to answer, move, or otherwise respond by 11/4/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/24/2019. (Phillips, Lauren)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint, or otherwise move as to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint up to and inclusive of November 4, 2019 by Collecto, Inc.. (Quinn, Lori)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Jean Quinn on behalf of Collecto, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Quinn, Lori)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heesoo Kim. Collecto, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Barshay, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Collecto, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Heesoo Kim (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collecto, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11824505 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Heesoo Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heesoo Kim
Represented By: David M. Barshay
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Jean Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?