Mtivity Inc. v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mtivity Inc.
Defendant: Elynxx Solutions Inc., Office Depot, Inc. and Does 1-35
Case Number: 1:2019cv05094
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for pre motion conference to set forth the basis for our proposed motion to dismiss Plaintiff Mtivity, Inc.'s Complaint for Damages by Office Depot, Inc.. (Chevalier, Charles)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hamilton Hill Chevalier on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chevalier, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/11/2019. (Marino, Janine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2019 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE (Paid): $ 150.00, receipt number 4653143522 (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (For Daniel Berko) by Mtivity Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653143522 (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Elynxx Solutions Inc., Office Depot, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-35, Elynxx Solutions Inc., Office Depot, Inc., filed by Mtivity Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mtivity Inc. v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elynxx Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mtivity Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Berko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?