J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Jara et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: NY Pizza Cafe & Spanish Food Restaurant Corp. and Luis Jara
Case Number: 1:2019cv05111
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Luis Jara answer due 11/18/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/25/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Luis Jara. (Ramesar, Thameera)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Luis Jara served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. NY Pizza Cafe & Spanish Food Restaurant Corp. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Luis Jara, NY Pizza Cafe & Spanish Food Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: #1 NY Pizza summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Luis Jara, NY Pizza Cafe & Spanish Food Restaurant Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11827928 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Jara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Pizza Cafe & Spanish Food Restaurant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?