Battah v. Vice Media LLC
Plaintiff: Habib Battah
Defendant: Vice Media LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05161
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, November 21, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than November 19, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/28/2019. (Guy, Alicia) (Guy, Alicia).
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vice Media LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vice Holding Inc. for Vice Media LLC. (Pelosi, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Vice Media LLC. (Pelosi, John)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; defendant Vice Media LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/3/2019. (Walker, Anna)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Vice Media LLC. (Distefano, Angelo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelo Trent Distefano on behalf of Vice Media LLC (aty to be noticed) (Distefano, Angelo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Pelosi on behalf of Vice Media LLC (aty to be noticed) (Pelosi, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Vice Media LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vice Media LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11835830 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Habib Battah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battah v. Vice Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habib Battah
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?