J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Vasquez et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Defendant: Cleotilde Vasquez, La Parranda Mexicana Bar & Restaurante Co. Inc. and Cleotilde Draganides
Case Number: 1:2019cv05238
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. Cleotilde Vasquez served on 10/19/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 11/14/2019 at 11:00 am in Chambers 704S and the submission of the mandatory requirements is correspondingly adjusted. Plaintiff is directed to file proof of service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l) promptly after service is made. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/24/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on for 10/31/19 at 11am by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. La Parranda Mexicana Bar & Restaurante Co. Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/17/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to La Parranda Mexicana Bar & Restaurante Co. Inc., Cleotilde Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J&J Sports Productions Inc. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against La Parranda Mexicana Bar & Restaurante Co. Inc., Cleotilde Vasquez filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11845100 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Vasquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleotilde Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Parranda Mexicana Bar & Restaurante Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleotilde Draganides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?