Rajab v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Hussam Zuhir Rajab
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security - United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv05251
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees.Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 10/7/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION Of Dismissal: The above-captioned matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/3/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hussam Zuhir Rajab (Menschel, Brooke)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Marutollo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Marutollo, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hussam Zuhir Rajab. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Menschel, Brooke)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hussam Zuhir Rajab. (Menschel, Brooke)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hussam Zuhir Rajab. (Menschel, Brooke)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hussam Zuhir Rajab. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Menschel, Brooke)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/16/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Hussam Zuhir Rajab (Menschel, Brooke)
September 16, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT re FOIA against Department of Homeland Security, Department of Homeland Security - United States Citizenship & Immigration Services filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11847877 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Hussam Zuhir Rajab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Menschel, Brooke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajab v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussam Zuhir Rajab
Represented By: Brooke Menschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security - United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?