Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company et al v. Highbury Concrete Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harleysville Insurance Company and Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Defendant: Orrino Capital Services LLC and Highbury Concrete Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05300
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On or before 12/4/2019, Highbury Concrete Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/28/2019. (Shanies, Rachel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Highbury Concrete Inc.. (Finkelstein, Jason)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Harleysville Insurance Company. Orrino Capital Services LLC served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Schiffer, Larry)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Harleysville Insurance Company. Highbury Concrete Inc. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Schiffer, Larry)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Mullaly on behalf of Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Mullaly, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aneca E. Lasley on behalf of Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Lasley, Aneca)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry P. Schiffer on behalf of Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Schiffer, Larry)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorneys shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorneys shall file notices of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorneys shall ensure the $150 admission fees be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/15/2019. (Shanies, Rachel)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11932912. by Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ohio Certificate of Good Standing) (Lasley, Aneca)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11932696. by Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Massachusetts Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Ohio Certificate of Good Standing) (Mullaly, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Orrino summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc. for Harleysville Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. (Schiffer, Larry)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11857222 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Harleysville Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Schiffer, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company et al v. Highbury Concrete Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry P. Schiffer
Represented By: Aneca E. Lasley
Represented By: Michael T Mullaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry P. Schiffer
Represented By: Aneca E. Lasley
Represented By: Michael T Mullaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orrino Capital Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highbury Concrete Inc.
Represented By: Jason Robert Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?