Vila v. Vice Media LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos Vila
Defendant: Vice Media LLC
Not Yet Classified: Usher T. Winslett
Case Number: 1:2019cv05332
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Usher T. Winslett selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on December 18, 2019, 9:30 a.m., 6 East 39th Street, 6th Floor, New York, NY 10016.,. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 1/2/2020. (Distefano, Angelo)
November 1, 2019 MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Rey, Julissa)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation: The parties having expressed a desire to reach an amicable resolution of this case, this case is referred to the EDNY Mediation Panel. For assistance with any questions about the mediation process or the selection of a mediator, counsel are invited to contact EDNY ADR Administrator Robyn Weinstein at (718) 613-2578. The mediation shall be completed by 12/20/2019. Selection of Mediator due by 11/15/2019.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/1/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Entry And Order: For proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: An in person Initial Conference was held on 11/1/2019, counsel for both parties were present. The parties shall submit a joint certification that discovery has been completed by 8/01/2020. Deadlines set based on parties' submitted joint discovery worksheet and are as follow: All fact discovery shall be completed by 6/04/2020; any dispositive motion shall be filed by 8/31/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/01/2019. (FTR Log #12:26-12:32.) (Manson, Eddie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Carlos Vila (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, James)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Pelosi, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vice Media LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vice Holding Inc. for Vice Media LLC. (Pelosi, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Vice Media LLC. (Pelosi, John)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 12:00 PM on 11/01/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 11/01/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/7/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint #8 is hereby granted. Defendant must file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/25/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/3/2019. (Ferrara, Anthony)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Vice Media LLC. (Distefano, Angelo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelo Trent Distefano on behalf of Vice Media LLC (aty to be noticed) (Distefano, Angelo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Pelosi on behalf of Vice Media LLC (aty to be noticed) (Pelosi, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vice Media LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vice Media LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11861896 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Carlos Vila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vila v. Vice Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Media LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Pelosi
Represented By: Angelo Trent Distefano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Vila
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Usher T. Winslett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?