Cricut, Inc. v. APA Technology Ltd. Co. et al
Plaintiff: CRICUT, INC.
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES NOS. 1-25, APA TECHNOLOGY LTD. CO., COMPANIES XYZ NOS. 1-25 and Companies XYZ nos.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05380
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
2 Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann: Initial Conference Hearing held on 2/12/2020. Fact Discovery is to be completed by August 21, 2020. See attached Minute Entry. (LK) Modified date 2/13/2020
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Hengl on behalf of Cricut, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hengl, Suzanne)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, Monday's initial conference is adjourned to Wednesday, February 12, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/6/2020. (LK)
January 30, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 2/10/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/24/2020. (Vallens, Adrian)
January 22, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APA Technology Ltd. Co. (Wang, Timothy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint,,,, by APA Technology Ltd. Co.. (Wang, Timothy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against APA Technology Ltd. Co., Companies XYZ nos., John/Jane Does Nos. 1-25, filed by Cricut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (updated), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48) (Reilly, Paul)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/20/2019. (Kuntz, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by APA Technology Ltd. Co.. (Wang, Timothy)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/16/2019. (LK)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cricut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tobin, David)
December 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as the wrong notice of motion and affidavit are attached. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/13/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
December 13, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tyler M. Beas. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/13/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12155866. by Cricut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tobin, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12154918. by Cricut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beas, Tyler)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 11/25/2019. (Douglas, Maura)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by APA Technology Ltd. Co.. (Wang, Timothy)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/25/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12094684. by APA Technology Ltd. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Wang, Timothy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by Cricut, Inc.. Last publication date November 4, 2019. (Reilly, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Service by Publication. Plaintiff shall attempt to serve Defendant APA Technology Ltd. Co. as follows: by electronic messages via the contact features of Defendants' respective internet storefronts maintained at Amazon.com, Alibaba.com, and nicapadiy.com; through the direct message features available on Defendants' social media pages; and via e-mail to the listed contact in formation on file with the Colorado Secretary of State, United States Patent & Trademark Office, and domain name registrars. See attached for details. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/30/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Service by Publication by Cricut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Proposed Order) (Reilly, Paul)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to APA Technology Ltd. Co.. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRICUT, INC. (Reilly, Paul)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by CRICUT, INC. (Reilly, Paul)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,, by CRICUT, INC. (Reilly, Paul)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APA TECHNOLOGY LTD. CO., COMPANIES XYZ NOS. 1-25, JOHN/JANE DOES NOS. 1-25 filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11868719 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by CRICUT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31) (Reilly, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cricut, Inc. v. APA Technology Ltd. Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRICUT, INC.
Represented By: Paul J. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES NOS. 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APA TECHNOLOGY LTD. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANIES XYZ NOS. 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companies XYZ nos.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?