Madorskaya v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Olga Madorskaya
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and VW Credit, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05390
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: I Leo Glasser
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order The settlement conference scheduled for November 12th will instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on December 12th unless the stipulation of settlement and dismissal is electronically filed with the Court no later than December 10th. There will be no further adjournments of this conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/11/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
November 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement with VW Credit, Inc. by Olga Madorskaya (Kroub, Edward)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement with Equifax Information Services, LLC by Olga Madorskaya (Kroub, Edward)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Brownstein, Boris)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The settlement conference scheduled for November 5th will instead be held at 5:00 p.m. on November 12, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/25/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for November 5, 2019 by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on November 5, 2019 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. The Plaintiff client and a principal with full settlement authority for the Defendants must attend the conference with all counsel. By November 1st, counsel shall submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing through the Court's ECF system. If the case fails to settle during the conference a discovery schedule will be set by the Court, therefore, a discovery schedule is NOT to be submitted prior to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/22/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer VW Credit, Inc. answer due 11/18/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/8/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by VW Credit, Inc.. (Massand, Shan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VW Credit, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG, Corporate Parent Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., for VW Credit, Inc.. (Massand, Shan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of VW Credit, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, VW Credit, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11870233 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Olga Madorskaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madorskaya v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VW Credit, Inc.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Madorskaya
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?