Hinds v. Jetblue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William Hinds
Defendant: Cheap Tickets Net Inc., Jetblue Airways Corporation and Caribbean Airlines Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv05424
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulation and Order dated 11/22/19 Dismissing with prejudice as to Caribbean Airlines Limited. Cheap Tickets Net Inc. dismissed for failure to file proof of service. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/22/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order by Caribbean Airlines Limited (Groendyk, Zachary)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Only plaintiff, JetBlue, and Caribbean Airlines have appeared in this matter. The Court strongly urged the parties to discuss settlement. The Court shall hold a telephone conference on 11/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for defendant Caribbean Airlines Limited ("CAL") is requested to arrange and initiate the telephone conference. After establishing contact with plaintiff and JetBlue's counsel, CAL's counsel shall contact the Court at (718) 613-2170. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 10/30/2019. C/mailed. (Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Conference held on 10/30/2019. Recorded. Tick #(s) 10:49 - 11:14; 11:59 - 12:09. Appearance for Plaintiff: William Hinds, pro se. Appearances for Defendants: James J. D'Ambrosio, Esq. & Zachary Groendyk, Esq. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Jetblue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (D'Ambrosio, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary David Groendyk on behalf of Caribbean Airlines Limited (aty to be noticed) (Groendyk, Zachary)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order dated October 7, 2019 served on Plaintiff and Codefendants on October 9, 2019, filed by Caribbean Airlines Limited. (Maggio, John)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation ("JetBlue") filed an answer which was attached to the notice of removal, ECF No. #1 -3; however, counsel has not yet filed a notice of appearance on JetBlue's behalf. Counsel for JetBlue shall file a notice of appearance forthwith. The Court shall hold the initial conference on 10/30/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Court. Counsel for Defendant Caribbean Airlines Limited shall serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff and co-defendants and file proof of service forthwith. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 10/7/2019. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Initial Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to JetBlue's Cross-Claim by Caribbean Airlines Limited. (Maggio, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Caribbean Airlines Limited (Maggio, John)
September 27, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions ***INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page***. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caribbean Airlines Limited from Civil Court, Kings County, case number CV-024697-19/KI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11876855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit JetBlue's Answer with Cross-Claims) (Maggio, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinds v. Jetblue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheap Tickets Net Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Represented By: James J. D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Airlines Limited
Represented By: John Maggio
Represented By: Zachary David Groendyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?