Phillip v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: KWASI PHILLIP
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2007-NC2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-NC2 at c/o Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05507
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Reply ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant by All Plaintiffs. (Morgenstern, Yehuda)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with, COUNTERCLAIM against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Chuke, Odera)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with, COUNTERCLAIM against Kwasi Phillip by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Chuke, Odera)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/31/19 to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/7/2019. (Levy, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Chuke, Odera)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Yehuda C. Morgenstern on behalf of Kwasi Phillip (aty to be noticed) (Morgenstern, Yehuda)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Berg on behalf of Kwasi Phillip (aty to be noticed) (Berg, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 27, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11892387 (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2007-NC2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-NC2 at c/o Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 518457/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chuke, Odera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillip v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2007-NC2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-NC2 at c/o Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Odera Chuke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Odera Chuke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KWASI PHILLIP
Represented By: Abraham David
Represented By: Yehuda C. Morgenstern
Represented By: David Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?