Eppel v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Irena Eppel
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs. and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv05555
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Irena Eppel. U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs. served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Prakhin, Yuriy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Irena Eppel. United States of America served on 11/6/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Prakhin, Yuriy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Irena Eppel (Prakhin, Yuriy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Irena Eppel (Prakhin, Yuriy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Irena Eppel (Prakhin, Yuriy)
October 2, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs., United States of America (Prakhin, Yuriy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IRENA EPPEL against United States of America, U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11900542 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by United States of America, U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Prakhin, Yuriy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eppel v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs.
Represented By: Yuriy Prakhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Yuriy Prakhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irena Eppel
Represented By: Yuriy Prakhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?