Allstate Insurance Company et al v. New Century Pharmacy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: My Rx Pharmacy, Inc., Rafo Yaguda, Life Health Care Medical, P.C., Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Eduard Aronov, First Class Medical, P.C., Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D., GONY Medical Services P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C., Katrin Matatov, Boris Kandov, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., Mani Ushyarov, D.O. and New Century Pharmacy Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05702
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, New Century Pharmacy Inc.. (Lazzaro, Lance)
November 29, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C.. (Horn, Charles)
November 29, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.. (Horn, Charles)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc., Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, and Rafo Yaguda. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/18/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 15, 2019 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Rafo Yaguda. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer) (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, and New Century Pharmacy Inc. ("Defendants"). Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2019. (Shanies, Rachel)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to GONY Medical Services P.C, Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., NY Medical Arts, P.C. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 11/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 13, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Rafo Yaguda (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Horn, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Horn, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Horn on behalf of Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Horn, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Horn on behalf of GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D. (aty to be noticed) (Horn, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint as to defendants New Century Pharmacy Inc., Eduard Aronov and Katrin Matatov by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
November 8, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eduard Aronov. Eduard Aronov waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Lazzaro, Lance)
November 8, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Lazzaro on behalf of Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, New Century Pharmacy Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lazzaro, Lance)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to First Class Medical, P.C. and Mani Ushyarov, D.O. (the "Relevant Defendants"). The Relevant Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/7/2019. (Shanies, Rachel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint as to defendants First Class Medical, P.C. and Mani Ushyarov, D.O. by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Boris Kandov and My Rx Pharmacy, Inc. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 1/9/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 1/6/2020. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/7/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 6, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Boris Kandov, My Rx Pharmacy, Inc.. (Campese, Maria)
November 6, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of First Class Medical, P.C., Mani Ushyarov, D.O. (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D. served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D. served on 11/2/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Boris Kandov served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Mani Ushyarov, D.O. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Eduard Aronov served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D. served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Katrin Matatov served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Alexander Sharafyan served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Life Health Care Medical, P.C. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. GONY Medical Services P.C. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Richmond Medical Care P.C. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. NY Medical Arts, P.C. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. First Class Medical, P.C. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. My Rx Pharmacy, Inc. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. New Century Pharmacy Inc. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Rafo Yaguda served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Campese on behalf of Boris Kandov, My Rx Pharmacy, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Campese, Maria)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Boris Kandov, My Rx Pharmacy, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Eduard Aronov, Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., First Class Medical, P.C., GONY Medical Services P.C., Boris Kandov, Life Health Care Medical, P.C., Katrin Matatov, My Rx Pharmacy, Inc., NY Medical Arts, P.C., New Century Pharmacy Inc., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D., Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Mani Ushyarov, D.O.. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Garcia-Vieux on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna L. Sullivan on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Shauna)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Whitcher on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Whitcher, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (King, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eduard Aronov, Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., First Class Medical, P.C., GONY Medical Services P.C., Boris Kandov, Life Health Care Medical, P.C., Katrin Matatov, My Rx Pharmacy, Inc., NY Medical Arts, P.C., New Century Pharmacy Inc., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D., Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Mani Ushyarov, D.O., Rafo Yaguda filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11927600 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28) (King, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. New Century Pharmacy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Rx Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafo Yaguda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Health Care Medical, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduard Aronov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Class Medical, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GONY Medical Services P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Sharafyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Medical Arts, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrin Matatov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Kandov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond Medical Care P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mani Ushyarov, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?