Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Dowd, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Andrew J. Dowd, M.D. and Triborough Orthopedics, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05716
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Vacate; the default entered against defendant, Triborough Orthopedics, P.C. and the default entered against defendant, Andrew J. Dowd, M.D. is vacated and that defendants be permitted to file an answer to the complaint within 20 days from this Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/2/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION to Vacate Default, First MOTION to Set Aside Default by Andrew J. Dowd, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Verschell, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #17 Letter requesting adjournment. Initial Status Conference previously set for 11/21/2019 is adjourned sine die. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to move for default judgment with detailed proof of damages within 14 days of the date of this Order. In addition, counsel is advised that this letter should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion" since it seeks relief from the Court. Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/19/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 VACATED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT, It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Andrew J. Dowd, M.D. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Andrew J. Dowd, M.D. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lee, Tiffeny) Modified on 12/3/2019 to vacate default as per Judge Cogan's Order of 12/2/19 (Guzzi, Roseann).
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 Letter to Judge Cogan requesting adjournment of November 21, 2019 initial conference by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Whitcher, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 VACATED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Triborough Orthopedics, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Triborough Orthopedics, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) Modified on 12/3/2019 to vacate default as per Judge Cogan's Order of 12/2/19 (Guzzi, Roseann).
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (Sullivan, Shauna)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (Sullivan, Shauna)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Andrew J. Dowd, M.D. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Triborough Orthopedics, P.C. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Whitcher, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 11/21/2019 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/10/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew J. Dowd, M.D., Triborough Orthopedics, P.C.. (Davis, Kimberly) .
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Garcia-Vieux on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna L. Sullivan on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Shauna)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Whitcher on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Whitcher, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (King, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew J. Dowd, M.D., Triborough Orthopedics, P.C. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11931218 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9) (King, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Dowd, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Dowd, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triborough Orthopedics, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?