Galvez v. Venkata et al
Plaintiff: IAN GALVEZ
Defendant: NAGASAI PAGADALA, RAVINDRA MURALIDHAR CHITTINEEDI, Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata and Ravi Chittineedi
Case Number: 1:2019cv05978
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: terminating #9 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to the Court's Individual Motion Practice and Rules, "a pre-motion conference with the Court must be requested before making any motion" to dismiss. Rule III(A). If permission to file a motion is granted, then, "the parties are to jointly file a letter proposing a briefing schedule for Court approval." Rule III(B). "No party is to serve any motion paper prior to obtaining court approval of the schedule." Furthermore, "no motion paper shall be filed until the motion has been fully briefed." Rule III(D). Defendants have filed an unauthorized motion to dismiss #9 which fails to comply with these rules. Accordingly, the motion at #9 is terminated, and Defendants are directed to review the Court's Individual Rules. Defendants shall file any request for a pre-motion conference by January 3, 2020. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/18/2019. (Craft, Rachel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata, Nagasai Pagadala. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Complaint) (Granat, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian Galvez. Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata served on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Nagasai Pagadala served on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/27/2020 @ 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/13/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - 12/12/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/13/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or move by Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata, Nagasai Pagadala. (Granat, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Granat on behalf of Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata, Nagasai Pagadala (aty to be noticed) (Granat, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata, Nagasai Pagadala. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAVINDRA MURALIDHAR CHITTINEEDI, NAGASAI PAGADALA filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11974047 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by IAN GALVEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed summons) (Grunsfeld, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez v. Venkata et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAGASAI PAGADALA
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Granat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAVINDRA MURALIDHAR CHITTINEEDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravindra Muralidhar Chittineedi Venkata
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Granat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi Chittineedi
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Granat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAN GALVEZ
Represented By: Gerald D. Grunsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?