Milton v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Milton
Defendant: Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq., Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL, Dawn Polewac, David Schneider, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ann Poole, Tom Rosicki, Paramount Land, Inc., Craig Wolfson, Enterprise Process Service, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., WMC Mortgage Corporation, RAS Boriskin, LLC and Cynthia Rosicki
Case Number: 1:2019cv05983
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: If Attorney John P. DeMaio wishes to file submissions on this docket, he must, not having been listed as an attorney at the time of case opening, file a Notice of Appearance on this docket. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/19/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
December 17, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Jacob Milton. (DeMaio, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jacob Milton (DeMaio, John)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: In light of the foregoing, plaintiff's counsel in this action, Miali A. Makelele of Makelele & Associates, LLC, is ordered to show cause on or before December 17,2019, why counsel should not be held in contempt of court for failure to comply with court orders and to appear at a scheduled court appearance. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/10/2019. (Fernandez, Erica)
December 10, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY: A pre-motion conference was held before Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/10/2019. Appearances for defendants: Joseph F. Battista, Andrew C. Morganstern, David S. Yohay. No counsel appeared for plaintiff. Plaintiff's counsel was called by chambers at the telephone number listed on the docket but could not be reached. The case was called. Defendants' counsel proposed to file motions to dismiss, for sanctions, and for a filing injunction. The briefing schedule for those motions is as follows: defendants will file their motions on or before January 24, 2020; plaintiff's opposition is due on or before February 14, 2020; defendants' reply, if any, is due February 21, 2020. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Phillips, Alice)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #24 Motion to Vacate: The pre-motion conference on Tuesday, December 10, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. will take place as scheduled. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/9/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
December 9, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION to Vacate Order directing pre-motion conference by Cynthia Rosicki, Tom Rosicki, Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C.. (Morganstern, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-motion conference previously scheduled for Thursday, December 5, 2019, at 3:00 PM is adjourned to Tuesday, December 10, 2019, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Additionally, having failed to comply with the Court's prior orders, plaintiff is once again directed to respond to defendants' letter-motions #10 , #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , and #19 ; plaintiff shall do so no later than Thursday, December 5, 2019, at 5:00 PM. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/3/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Adjourn Conference to December 10, 2019 by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Yohay, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paramount Land, Inc. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enterprise Process Service, Inc. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot Motions for Pre Motion Conference #16 , #17 , #18 , and #19 . A pre-motion conference has been scheduled; see docket entry dated 11/19/2019. The Court will address proposed motions to dismiss by the defendants submitting letters #16 , #17 , #18 , and #19 at the December 5, 2019, conference. If the defendants submitting these letters wish to move to dismiss at this time on any grounds other than those incorporated by reference from letters #10 and #15 , they must file further letters on the docket setting forth those additional bases for the anticipated motion no later than November 21, 2019, pursuant to this Court's Individual Rule 3(A). Plaintiff is further directed to respond to any such additional letters, in addition to letters #10 and #15 , no later than November 26, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/19/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Enterprise Process Service, Inc.. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Craig Wolfson. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for pre motion conference re #16 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Paramount Land, Inc., Dawn Polewac, Ann Poole. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Cynthia Rosicki, Tom Rosicki, Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C.. (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #15 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference has been scheduled; see docket entry dated 11/19/2019. The Court will address proposed motions to dismiss as discussed in letters #10 and #15 at the December 5, 2019, conference. Plaintiff is further directed to respond to letter #15 , in addition to letter #10 , no later than November 26, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/19/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for pre motion conference by Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq, RAS Boriskin, LLC, Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL, David Schneider. (Battista, Joseph)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Craig Wolfson (aty to be noticed) (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Enterprise Process Service, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Paramount Land, Inc., Dawn Polewac, Ann Poole (aty to be noticed) (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Cynthia Rosicki, Tom Rosicki, Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Morganstern, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference: A pre-motion conference will be held on Thursday, December 5, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10D South before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Plaintiff is directed to respond to defendants' letter-motion #10 no later than Tuesday, November 26, 2019, pursuant to this Court's Individual Rule 3(A). So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/19/2019. (Phillips, Alice)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for pre motion conference by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Yohay, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Yohay, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Yohay on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (aty to be noticed) (Yohay, David)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The removing defendants shall ensure that Plaintiff is aware of the conference date and this Court's Order. Plaintiff shall ensure that all Defendants are aware of the conference date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq, RAS Boriskin, LLC, Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL, David Schneider (Battista, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq, RAS Boriskin, LLC, Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL, David Schneider (Battista, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq, RAS Boriskin, LLC, Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL, David Schneider (Battista, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq, RAS Boriskin, LLC, Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL, David Schneider from New York State Supreme Court Queens County, case number 717792/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11974625) (Battista, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertson Anschutz & Schneid, PL
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Polewac
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schneider
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: David Yohay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Poole
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Rosicki
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Land, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wolfson
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Process Service, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: David Yohay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAS Boriskin, LLC
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Rosicki
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Milton
Represented By: John Peter DeMaio
Represented By: Miali A Makelele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?