Singer v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Plaintiff: Solomon Singer
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv05992
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's answer with affirmative defenses in response to Defendant's counterclaims by Solomon Singer. (Wolk, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Wolk on behalf of Solomon Singer (aty to be noticed) (Wolk, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:00 AM on 2/7/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 2/7/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/5/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Fannie Mae's ANSWER to Complaint by Plaintiff Solomon Singer, COUNTERCLAIM against Solomon Singer by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Mordkoff, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Mordkoff, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Swanson on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (aty to be noticed) (Swanson, Adam)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association from New York Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 519200/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11977733) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - State Court Affidavits of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Mordkoff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singer v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Singer
Represented By: Paul Robert Kenney
Represented By: Michael B. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?