Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Beynin et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO Indemnity Co. and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: Bruce Jacobson, D.C., Joseph Detullio, D.C., Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, D.C., Diana Beynin, D.C., Spine Care of NJ PC and Axis Chiropractic, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06118
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; and ORDER denying Defendants' request for an Order directing plaintiffs to file a RICO statement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/26/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 26, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint filed by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Gershenoff, Max)
December 24, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint by Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, DC, Axis Chiropractic, P.C., Diana Beynin, DC, Joseph Detullio, DC, Bruce Jacobson, DC, Spine Care of NJ PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, George)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendants Diana Beynin, DC., Bruce Jacobson, DC and Spine Care of NJ PC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 6, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/11/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint by Diana Beynin, DC, Bruce Jacobson, DC, Spine Care of NJ PC. (Lewis, George)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by George Lewis, Jr on behalf of Diana Beynin, DC, Bruce Jacobson, DC, Spine Care of NJ PC (aty to be noticed) (Lewis, George)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, DC, Axis Chiropractic, P.C. and Joseph Detullio, DC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 6, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/3/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extedning time to answer by Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, DC, Axis Chiropractic, P.C., Joseph Detullio, DC (Lewis, George) Modified on 12/3/2019 to reflect that this is a motion. (Riquelme, Claudia).
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by George Lewis, Jr on behalf of Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, DC, Axis Chiropractic, P.C., Joseph Detullio, DC (aty to be noticed) (Lewis, George)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Spine Care of NJ PC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Diana Beynin, DC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Joseph Detullio, DC served on 11/11/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to Defendants enclosing Court's November 19, 2019 Order with Affidavit of Service by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Smith, Joshua)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Peter Albis, DC served on 11/11/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Axis Chiropractic, P.C. served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 14, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on defendants and file proof of service on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/8/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/7/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Smith on behalf of GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Joshua)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, DC, Axis Chiropractic, P.C., Diana Beynin, DC, Joseph Detullio, DC, Bruce Jacobson, DC, Spine Care of NJ PC. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, Peter Albis, DC, Axis Chiropractic, P.C., Diana Beynin, DC, Joseph Detullio, DC, Bruce Jacobson, DC, Spine Care of NJ PC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11994938 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Spine Care of NJ PC, #4 Exhibit 2 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA, #5 Exhibit 3 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims Identified - Axis Chiropractic, P.C.) (Gershenoff, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Beynin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Jacobson, D.C.
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Detullio, D.C.
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Spinal Care Rehabilitation PA
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Albis, D.C.
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Beynin, D.C.
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spine Care of NJ PC
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: George Lewis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?