Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Fazzese
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Lisa Fazzese
Case Number: 1:2019cv06148
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Lisa Fazzese. (Almonte, Giselle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Paolini, Thomas)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lisa Fazzese. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Paolini, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit Completed (2Page Form) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Group for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Paolini, Thomas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lisa Fazzese filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11999342 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Paolini, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Fazzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Fazzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Paolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?