Bhonsly v. CVS Albany, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: SUNIL BHONSLY
Defendant: CVS ALBANY, L.L.C. and CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv06192
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Stipulation of Dismissal filed at #11 the initial conference set for January 3, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/17/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sunil Bhonsly Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Buzzard, Lucas)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on January 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunil Bhonsly. CVS Albany, L.L.C. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Buzzard, Lucas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunil Bhonsly. CVS Health Corporation served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Buzzard, Lucas)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for All Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 18, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/4/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation. (Gilroy, Marcy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum on behalf of Sunil Bhonsly (aty to be noticed) (Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by SUNIL BHONSLY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buzzard, Lucas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS ALBANY, L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12004022 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by SUNIL BHONSLY. (Buzzard, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhonsly v. CVS Albany, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS ALBANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marcy A. Gilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: Marcy A. Gilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUNIL BHONSLY
Represented By: Lucas C. Buzzard
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?