Letom Management, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Letom Management, LLC
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06195
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order of Remand to Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 705820/2019. Defendant acknowledges that it cannot properly demonstrate federal subject matter jurisdiction at this time and the case is therefore remanded to state court. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/18/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bank of America, N.A. (Brennan, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the pre-motion conference letter to 11/18/2019. It is hard for the Court to imagine what crucial strategic consideration caused defendant to be so discourteous as not to stipulate to a five day extension. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/14/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Response to Defendant's Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference (DE #5) by Letom Management, LLC. ( Haffner, Steven)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 11/8/19 that defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within seven days why thisaction should not be remanded to state court. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/8/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from K. Mallory Brennan to Honorable Brian M. Cogan Pursuant to Individual Rule of Practice III.A.2 by Bank of America, N.A. (Brennan, Katherine)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Bank of America, N.A. (Brennan, Katherine)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number 705820/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12004964) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint) (Brennan, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Letom Management, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letom Management, LLC
Represented By: Steven R. Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?