Frenkel v. Salamon et al
Plaintiff: Mark Frenkel
Defendant: E-Commerce Expand, LLC, Yehuda I. Salamon, Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC, Riverstone, USA, LLC, Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc., Alla Kachan, John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 10 and David Salamon
Case Number: 1:2019cv06250
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY in Support re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court AP case number 1-19-01120. filed by E-Commerce Expand, LLC, Riverstone, USA, LLC, Yehuda I. Salamon, Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC, Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc.. (Dahiya, Karamvir)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Judge Amon providing working copies of Mark Frenkel's Opposition (Doc. 4). by Mark Frenkel (Fiveson, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court AP case number 1-19-01120. filed by Mark Frenkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Fiveson, David)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Nicole Burke on behalf of Mark Frenkel (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Burke, Jamie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Fiveson on behalf of Mark Frenkel (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fiveson, David)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re: #1 Defendants' motion to withdraw and dismiss. The briefing schedule for Defendants' motion is as follows: Plaintiff's opposition is due November 27, 2019, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by December 4, 2019. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/13/2019. (Cohn, Caroline)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court AP case number 1-19-01120. by E-Commerce Expand, LLC, Riverstone, USA, LLC, David Salamon, Yehuda I. Salamon, Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC, Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 #11-1 Exh. A, #3 #11-2 Exh. B, #4 #13 Affidavit and Certificate of Service, #5 BK Documents, #6 #16-1 Transmittal of Motion, #7 #16-2 Notice Recipients) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frenkel v. Salamon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Commerce Expand, LLC
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: Karamvir Dahiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yehuda I. Salamon
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: Karamvir Dahiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: Karamvir Dahiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverstone, USA, LLC
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: Karamvir Dahiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: Karamvir Dahiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alla Kachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salamon
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Frenkel
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Jamie Nicole Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?