Latypov v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marat Latypov
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Bank Of America, N.A., TD Bank USA, N.A. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06348
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Valenziano, Anthony)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Clay, Juliana)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Defendant Bank Of America, N.A., Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 2/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/3/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marat Latypov. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.; granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/9/2019. (Reyes, Ramon)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Clay, Juliana)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Clay, Juliana)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Valenziano, Anthony)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Carmine Valenziano on behalf of TD Bank USA, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Valenziano, Anthony)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana Clay on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Clay, Juliana)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Defendant Bank Of America, N.A., Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 1/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/2/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marat Latypov. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Kroub, Edward)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marat Latypov. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/13/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Marat Latypov (Kroub, Edward)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12030656 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Marat Latypov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latypov v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Anthony Carmine Valenziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Juliana Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marat Latypov
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?