Durrani et al v Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Aisha Durrani, Julia Stuhltrager, Jacob Savage, Melissa Brown and Melvin Rodriguez
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06379
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The conference previously scheduled for January 14, 2019 is canceled in light of Dkt. #9 Order of Remand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/11/2020. (Gillespie, Saudia)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Remand to Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 513752/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 12/11/2019. (Greene, Donna)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Letter re: Joint Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Remand by Bank of America, N.A. (Goldstein, Philip)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 19, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 12/9/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank of America, N.A.. (Goldstein, Philip)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on January 14, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for defendant is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with plaintiffs' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 9, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/15/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to the Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Goldstein, Philip)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America, N.A.. (Goldstein, Philip)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 513752/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12050221) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service) (Goldstein, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durrani et al v Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aisha Durrani
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Stuhltrager
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Savage
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Brown
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Rodriguez
Represented By: Justin Mitchell Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Philip A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?