Arcpe Holding LLC v. 9Q4U5E LLC et al
Plaintiff: ARCPE HOLDING LLC
Defendant: Discover Bank, 9Q4U5E LLC, Bank of America N.A., Alexander T Dator, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corp. and New York City Environmental Control Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv06417
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arcpe Holding LLC. Discover Bank served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arcpe Holding LLC. New York City Environmental Control Board served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arcpe Holding LLC. Bank of America N.A. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arcpe Holding LLC. Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corp. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/14/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Arcpe Holding LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12058997 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by ARCPE HOLDING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civll Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Certificate of Merit) (Eisenberg, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcpe Holding LLC v. 9Q4U5E LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9Q4U5E LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander T Dator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCPE HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Ross Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?