Chavez Lalvay v. Cuccinelli, II et. al.
Petitioner: Kevin Sebastian Chavez Lalvay
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2019cv06419
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion to dismiss case as moot. Plaintiff has filed a response to the motion "joining in" it and disavowing any intent to seek EAJA fees. The case is moot, so defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, dismissing the complaint. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/5/2020. (Cogan, Brian)
January 5, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Sebastian Chavez Lalvay. (Worth, Christopher)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The premotion conference is waived. The letter #6 is deemed to constitute defendants' motion to dismiss on the grounds stated. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion is due by 1/6/2020. The Initial Status Conference is adjourned until 1/9/2020 at 3:15 pm, at which time it shall be held in conjunction with oral argument on the motion in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/23/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Defedants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or, alternatively, for failure to state a claim by William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Sheldon)
December 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon A. Smith on behalf of William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Sheldon)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan for an Initial Status Conference on 1/2/2020 at 12:00 pm in Chambers 704S. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to notify all attorneys in this action of the conference schedule in writing. No later than 24 hours prior to the Initial Status Conference, the Government must file a brief letter advising the Court whether the status of the case has changed since the filing of the complaint. Counsel is directed to review Judge Cogan's Individual Practices, which may be obtained on the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/content/judge-brian-m-cogan. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Cogan's Rules. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/15/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 13, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-12059136 (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Petition for Writ of Mandamus against William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kevin Sebastian Chavez Lalvay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M) (Flanagan, Doreen) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/14/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/14/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez Lalvay v. Cuccinelli, II et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Sebastian Chavez Lalvay
Represented By: Christopher Worth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Sheldon A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?