Daniels v. Johnson, III et al
Plaintiff: Duvall S. Daniels
Defendant: Albert S. Johnson, III, "John Doe" - Driver and Apple's Motor Express LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06428
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER Settlement Conference is set for 7/15/2020 @ 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/9/2020. (LK)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann: Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/9/2020. Fact discovery is to be completed by July 10, 2020. The next settlement conference is scheduled for July 15, 2020 @ 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff must attend. See attached Minute Entry. (LK)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Flaster on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Fier, Jonathan) Modified to (R.A. Flaster) on 1/9/2020 (LK).
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Payne on behalf of Apple's Motor Express LLC, Albert S. Johnson, III (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service of Notice of Appearance) (Payne, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for January 9, 2020 @ 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13C South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/5/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Duvall S. Daniels (Fier, Jonathan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple's Motor Express LLC, Albert S. Johnson, III (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service of Jury Demand) (Cotignola, Felice)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal with Attachments served on Robert A. Flaster, P.C. on November 14, 2019, filed by Apple's Motor Express LLC, Albert S. Johnson, III. (Cotignola, Felice)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Apple's Motor Express LLC, Albert S. Johnson, III (Cotignola, Felice)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Apple's Motor Express LLC, Albert S. Johnson, III from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 714618/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12062207) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Demand for Damages) (Cotignola, Felice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Johnson, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert S. Johnson, III
Represented By: Felice Jill Cotignola
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "John Doe" - Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple's Motor Express LLC
Represented By: Felice Jill Cotignola
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duvall S. Daniels
Represented By: Jonathan Aron Fier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?