Yesh Music, LLC v. Youth Education In The Arts
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC
Defendant: Youth Education In The Arts
Case Number: 1:2019cv06449
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Electronic entry terminating civil case) (Hong, Loan)
December 27, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (Valentin, Winnethka)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yesh Music, LLC With Prejudice (Garbarini, Richard)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Spitz on behalf of Youth Education In The Arts (aty to be noticed) (Spitz, Alice)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Youth Education In The Arts. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Youth Education In The Arts filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12066080 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registrations, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice, #4 Exhibit Notice) (Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yesh Music, LLC v. Youth Education In The Arts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youth Education In The Arts
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?