Simmons v. Law Offices of Scott D. Gross et al
Plaintiff: Alice Simmons
Defendant: Jennifer Terry, Scott D. Gross and Law Offices of Scott D. Gross
Case Number: 1:2019cv06463
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/10/2020. (LK)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Lastorino on behalf of Scott D. Gross, Law Offices of Scott D. Gross, Jennifer Terry (aty to be noticed) (Lastorino, Carol)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Scott D. Gross, Law Offices of Scott D. Gross, Jennifer Terry. (DiGennaro, Janice)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice J. DiGennaro on behalf of Scott D. Gross, Law Offices of Scott D. Gross, Jennifer Terry (aty to be noticed) (DiGennaro, Janice)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alice Simmons. Waiver sent to all defendants on 11/15/2019; answer due 1/14/2020. (Green, Remy) Modified on 12/16/2019 to add date sent and answer due date. (Layne, Monique).
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott D. Gross, Law Offices of Scott D. Gross, Jennifer Terry filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12068359 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Alice Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition / Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Confirmation of Amount Due on Date Petition Was Filed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Law Offices of Scott Gross, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Scott Gross, #6 Proposed Summons for Jennifer Terry) (Green, Remy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Law Offices of Scott D. Gross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Simmons
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Terry
Represented By: Janice J. DiGennaro
Represented By: Carol A. Lastorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Gross
Represented By: Janice J. DiGennaro
Represented By: Carol A. Lastorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Scott D. Gross
Represented By: Janice J. DiGennaro
Represented By: Carol A. Lastorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?