Zerib et al v. Feteer Factory Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nabil Zerbib, Vera Lopez, Cirilo Vera Lopez and Nabil Zerib
Defendant: Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad and Oga Boutros
Case Number: 1:2019cv06472
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Oga Boutros served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Stillman, Lina)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Mourad A Mourad served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Stillman, Lina)
January 7, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re #10 SUMMONS Returned Executed electronically filed Lina Stillman, Esq. on 12/12/19 --- Because of plaintiffs' counsels selections while electronically filing the returned executed summons the docket entry text indicated that plaintiffs served plaintiffs. The Clerk has deleted and reentered the filing with the correct information, so no corrective action by plaintiffs' counsel is required. DO NOT REFILE your document. When filing documents on ECF it is imperative that counsel select the correct filing party, and if relevant, any other party. If you are unsure of the appropriate event you can contact the Clerk's Office for assistance. CM/ECF training is available at the courthouse free of charge. For more information regarding training, counsel can contact Evelyn Levine, Training Specialist, at (718) 613-2312. (Guy, Alicia)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER -- To ensure compliance with the requirements of both Mei Xing Yu v. Hasaki Rest., Inc., 2019 WL 6646618 (2d Cir. Dec. 6, 2019) and Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), I respectfully direct the parties as follows. In the event any defendant makes an offer of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68, the parties must promptly file, before filing any notice of acceptance of that offer, a notice that discloses all terms to which the parties have agreed (formally or otherwise, and regardless of whether the agreement is reduced to writing) that are not explicitly disclosed in the Rule 68 offer. The required notice must disclose all terms, including but not limited to the scope of any releases, any commitments regarding confidentiality or non-disparagement, and the apportionment of attorneys' fees. Any purported agreement that the parties fail to disclose in conformity with the foregoing requirements will be deemed void and unenforceable. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/17/2019. (Gutmann, Joseph)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cirilo Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerib. Feteer Factory Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Originally filed by: Stillman, Lina on 12/12/19) reentered on 1/7/2020 (Guy, Alicia).
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Oga Boutros, Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #4 Amended Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT To add Individual Defendant Oga Boutros and Correct Plaintiff's Name against Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad, Oga Boutros, filed by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib. (Stillman, Lina)
November 18, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit Completed (Plaintiff and Defendants Information Section) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Fateer Factory Inc.) (Stillman, Lina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib (Stillman, Lina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Feteer Factory Inc., Mourad A Mourad filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12069314 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vera Lopez, Nabil Zerbib. (Stillman, Lina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zerib et al v. Feteer Factory Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil Zerbib
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Lopez
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirilo Vera Lopez
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil Zerib
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feteer Factory Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mourad A Mourad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oga Boutros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?