Van Hoomissen v. Yunji Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Van Hoomissen
Defendant: Wei Ying, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Yunji Inc., Huan Hao, Qingrong Kong, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Top Capital Partners Limited, Shanglue Xiao, Yanhua Sun, Chen Chen and China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv06479
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 . The Initial Status Conference is adjourned, and defendant Yunji, Inc.'s time to answer extended, sine die, and will be reset after appointment of a lead plaintiff and consolidation of the related actions. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/3/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Griffin, Michael)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Musoff, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference , Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Yunji Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yunji Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Yunji Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Yunji Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fumerton, Robert)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 11:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chen Chen, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Huan Hao, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Qingrong Kong, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Yanhua Sun, Top Capital Partners Limited, Shanglue Xiao, Wei Ying, Yunji Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12070379 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Van Hoomissen. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hoomissen v. Yunji Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunji Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Represented By: Robert Alexander Fumerton
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huan Hao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qingrong Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Capital Partners Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanglue Xiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanhua Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Van Hoomissen
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?