Yesh Music, LLC v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC
Defendant: Navisite, LLC and Charter Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06490
Filed: November 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, the Court shall hold the initial conference in plaintiff's copyright case on February 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by February 19, 2020. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be received in writing at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this Order on defendant Navisite, LLC and file proof of service forthwith. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/10/2020. (Panjini, Madhura)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charter Communications, Inc. (Nepple, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant Charter Communications' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Nepple, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, granting Defendant's #11 Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/10/2019. (Charter Communications, Inc.'s answer due 1/8/2020.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The admitted attorney Michael L. Nepple is permitted to appear as counsel for Charter Communications, Inc. in the above-captioned action. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/10/2019. (The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Charter Communications, Inc. (Nepple, Michael) Modified. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice 5136812 Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12138483. by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Nepple, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yesh Music, LLC. Charter Communications, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Garbarini, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 exhibit 1, #3 exhibit 2) (Rocco, Christine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Navisite summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
November 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
November 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
November 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, Inc., Navisite, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12071277 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice) (Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yesh Music, LLC v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navisite, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Nepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?