Hu et al v. HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Plaintiff: Yin Lu and Michael Hu
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06534
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby adopted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/5/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Joint description of the case as required by Scheduling Order (Dkt No. 5) by HSBC Bank USA N.A. (Zarlock, Preston)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint dated October 17, 2019 of Plaintiffs, Michael Hu and Yin Lu by HSBC Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Weingarten, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Preston L. Zarlock on behalf of HSBC Bank USA N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Zarlock, Preston)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 12/5/2019 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/20/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA N.A. identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc., Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc. for HSBC Bank USA N.A.. (Weingarten, Richard)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HSBC Bank USA N.A. from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 522919/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12079491) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service) (Weingarten, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hu et al v. HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yin Lu
Represented By: Andy S. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hu
Represented By: Andy S. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Richard Weingarten
Represented By: Preston L. Zarlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?