Klein v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Klein
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. and Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06547
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Klein. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/15/2020. (Horowitz, Uri)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted; the stipulation, Docket Entry #10 , Attachment 1, is so ordered. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 15, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/17/2019. (Walker, Anna)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Stipulation to Extend Equifax's time to respond to the Complaint to January 15, 2020.) (Brownstein, Boris)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted; defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 13, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/9/2019. (Walker, Anna)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Turcotte on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. (aty to be noticed) (Turcotte, Christopher)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Klein. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Horowitz, Uri)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammy Klein. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Horowitz, Uri)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 JP Morgan summons, #2 Capital One summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12080627 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Tammy Klein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., #4 Proposed Summons Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.) (Horowitz, Uri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N. A.
Represented By: Christopher B. Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Klein
Represented By: Uri Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?