Rosario v. Fuentes Guedes et al
Plaintiff: JUANA ROSARIO
Defendant: EZEQUIEL A. FUENTES GUEDES and CLASSIC BUS LINES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06581
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 CASE: 1:19-cv-06581 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:19-cv-21840, filed 12/23/2019. (Marziliano, August)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. At a premotion conference in this automobile accident case, it became apparent that defendants are not subject to personal jurisdiction in New York state. Defendants are Florida citizens, and are not "at home" in New York. The accident occurred on the NJ Turnpike so there is no specific jurisdiction over defendants. Defendants orally moved to transfer this action to the District of New Jersey under 28 U.S.C. 1406. Plaintiff has consented to the motion. The motion is therefore granted, and the case is transferred to the District of New Jersey. The seven-day waiting period under the EDNY Local Rules is waived. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/13/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Re: Motion by Juana Rosario (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
December 6, 2019 Minute Entry and Order for Pre-motion Conference held on 12/6/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for both sides present. Defendant orally moved for transfer of venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. Decision reserved. Plaintiff shall file her opposition, if any, by 12/13/2019. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Denise Parisi.) (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Peter Giannopoulos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Giannopoulos, Nicholas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for pre motion conference on 12/6/19 at 2:15pm filed by Juana Rosario. (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The time of the Premotion conference previously set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM is reset to 2:15 PM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/4/2019. (Clarke, Melonie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Juana Rosario (aty to be noticed) (Jean-Jacques, Michelle)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a detailed response to defendants' #4 letter by 12/3/2019. A Premotion Conference on defendants' proposed motion to transfer venue will be held on 12/6/2019 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for pre motion conference by Classic Bus Lines, Inc., Ezequiel A. Fuentes Guedes. (Miller, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of New York, case number 708293\2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12086907) (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. Fuentes Guedes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANA ROSARIO
Represented By: Michelle Jean-Jacques
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Giannopoulos
Represented By: Mark J. Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZEQUIEL A. FUENTES GUEDES
Represented By: Michael S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLASSIC BUS LINES, INC.
Represented By: Michael S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?