Brown v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Cherice Brown and Cherice Brown, as Mother and Natural Guardian of A.B., an Infant
Defendant: and I.G., an Infant by his Parent and Natural Guardian "Jane Doe", The City of New York, New York City Department of Education, Uncommon Charter High School, Uncommon Schools, Inc. and I.G.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06642
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND REMANDING CASE. Defendants having not opposed plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint to withdraw the federal claims for relief, the motion is granted, and the federal claims are deemed withdrawn. There being no other basis for original jurisdiction over this action, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction since the case involves only state law and is at its earliest stages. See 28 U.S.C. 1367. The case is therefore remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/20/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Cherice Brown. (Donnelly, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as unnecessary #9 Letter Motion for Pre-Motion Conference to Amend the Complaint. The pre-motion conference is waived. This letter is deemed to constitute plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint. Defendants must file opposition, if there is any, by 12/15/2019. In light of this, the premotion and initial status conferences previously set for 12/17/2019 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/13/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a detailed response to defendants' #7 letter by 12/13/2019. A Premotion Conference on the proposed motion to dismiss will be held in conjunction with the Initial Status Conference already set for 12/17/2019 at 4:30 pm in Courtroom 8D South. The submission of a case management plan and joint summary letter required for the initial conference is waived. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/7/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth E. Pitcoff on behalf of Uncommon Charter High School, Uncommon Schools, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pitcoff, Kenneth)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Uncommon Charter High School, Uncommon Schools, Inc.. (Ockert, Lily)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 12/17/2019 at 4:30 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Uncommon Charter High School, Uncommon Schools, Inc. (Ockert, Lily)
November 26, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Uncommon Charter High School, Uncommon Schools, Inc. (Ockert, Lily)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uncommon Charter High School, Uncommon Schools, Inc. from Supreme Kings, case number 523053/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12098887) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Ockert, Lily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherice Brown
Represented By: Joseph Donnelly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherice Brown, as Mother and Natural Guardian of A.B., an Infant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and I.G., an Infant by his Parent and Natural Guardian "Jane Doe"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uncommon Charter High School
Represented By: Lily Anne Ockert
Represented By: Kenneth E. Pitcoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uncommon Schools, Inc.
Represented By: Lily Anne Ockert
Represented By: Kenneth E. Pitcoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?